Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Buenaventura Cardinal Córdoba Espinosa de la Cerda

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1724BornMadrid, Spain
6 Apr 176137.0AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
6 Apr 176137.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
28 Jun 176137.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
23 Nov 176137.7Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 176945.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
6 May 177753.1DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Córdoba Espinosa de la Cerda:
Cardinal Buenaventura Córdoba Espinosa de la Cerda (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013