Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Giuseppe Veneri

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1840Born
20 Dec 186222.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 189352.9AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
29 Jan 189353.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
18 Mar 190666.1DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Giuseppe Veneri
Bishop Vincenzo Giuseppe Veneri (born , died ) Bishop of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorcia, Diocese of Norcia
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Aquiro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017