Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Tescari

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1824BornBreganze
8 Aug 184722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
Nov 187449.9IncardinatedPriest of Parma, Italy
7 Jun 188661.5AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
13 Jun 188661.6Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
30 Jan 188762.2InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
8 Jul 190277.6DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Tescari:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Tescari (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013