Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Porro

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Andria, Italy

Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1838Born
20 Dec 186224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Andria, Italy
14 Dec 189153.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Andria, Italy
14 Dec 189153.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
20 Dec 189153.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
23 Mar 190465.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Porro
Bishop Stefano Porro (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndria
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017