Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Consenti, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1834Born
1 Nov 185218.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Mar 185924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Jun 189056.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nusco, Italy
23 Jun 189056.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
29 Jun 189056.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
26 Jan 189358.7SucceededBishop of Nusco, Italy
12 Jun 189359.1AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
13 Nov 190773.5DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Consenti
Bishop Giuseppe Consenti C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalatina, Archdiocese of Otranto
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 351, and Page 415
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 421
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017