Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agnello Renzullo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nola, Italy

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1836Born
24 Mar 186023.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188043.9AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
7 Mar 188043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
23 Jun 189054.2AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
11 Apr 192488.0ResignedBishop of Nola, Italy
11 Apr 192488.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
20 Oct 192589.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agnello Renzullo
Bishop Agnello Renzullo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 326, and Page 417
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017