Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Franchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Livorno, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1826Born
8 Apr 184822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 184822.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 188660.3AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
13 Jun 188660.3Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
11 Feb 189872.0ResignedBishop of Livorno, Italy
11 Feb 189872.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
16 Oct 190276.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Franchi (VIAF: 88723789)
Archbishop Leopoldo Franchi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 108, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017