Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Placido Maria Cardinal Schiaffino, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1829Born
17 Oct 184718.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1852²22.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Aug 187848.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
1 Sep 187848.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
2 Nov 187849.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
18 Nov 188455.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Consultations of Regulars
27 Jul 188555.8Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jul 188555.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
6 Apr 188858.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
20 Feb 188959.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
23 Sep 188960.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido Maria Schiaffino (VIAF: 48517878)
Placido Maria Cardinal Schiaffino O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Index

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopOblates of S. Francesca Romana di Tor de' Specchi, Monastery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSubiaco, Territorial Abbey of Subiaco, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Subiaco, Territorial Abbey of Subiaco, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria Nuova, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1885
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017