Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Jannoni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1832Born
22 Sep 185522.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188957.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
30 Dec 188957.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
5 Jan 189057.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
18 Sep 190471.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Jannoni
Bishop Giovanni Jannoni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampagnano, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri
Ordained BishopTrinite des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 187
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast