Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastião de Matos de Noronha

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1586BornMadrid
16 Mar 162639.2AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
7 Jun 162639.4Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
9 Nov 163548.8SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
9 Jun 163649.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
28 Jul 164154.5DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Sebastião de Matos de Noronha:
Archbishop Sebastião de Matos de Noronha (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 120, and Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015