Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos da Apresentação Fernandes

Deceased

Bishop of Aveiro, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1894Born
25 May 191824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
13 Dec 195258.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aveiro, Portugal
13 Dec 195258.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
19 Mar 195358.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus
11 Aug 195864.2AppointedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
21 Jan 196267.7DiedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Domingos da Apresentação Fernandes
Bishop Domingos da Apresentação Fernandes (born , died ) Bishop of Aveiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão João do Souto

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast