Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Garcia , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1469AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
22 May 1482AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Jul 1485DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Garcia
Archbishop Garcia O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 132, and Page 110
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1469, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast