Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Baltazar Limpo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹Born
149416.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 Nov 153658.8AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
23 May 155072.3AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
21 Mar 155981.2DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltazar Limpo (VIAF: 99333341)
Archbishop Baltazar Limpo O. Carm. (born 1478, died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoura

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 139
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1536, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast