Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Guilherme de la Garde

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Feb 1348AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
27 Jul 1349AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
16 Jun 1361AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
12 Dec 1371AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
1375¹DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guilherme de la Garde
Patriarch Guilherme de la Garde (died 1375) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 144, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 276, and Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jul 2017