Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Joaquim (José Antonio) de Oliveira Carvalho (da Imaculada Conceição Amarante), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1763BornAmarante, Portugal
23 Sep 178623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
6 Jul 182561.9SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
19 Dec 182562.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
May 1826²62.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
1835¹71.4DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Joaquim (José Antonio) de Oliveira Carvalho (da Imaculada Conceição Amarante)
Archbishop José Joaquim (José Antonio) de Oliveira Carvalho (da Imaculada Conceição Amarante) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died 1835) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 166
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016