Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio da Trindade de Vasconcellos Pereira de Melo

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1812BornSanta Christina de Figueiró
29 Dec 184432.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 186148.4SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
18 Mar 186148.6ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
26 May 186148.7Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
7 May 186350.7SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
1 Oct 186351.1ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
19 Nov 189583.2DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonio da Trindade de Vasconcellos Pereira de Melo:
Bishop Antonio da Trindade de Vasconcellos Pereira de Melo (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 143, and Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013