Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel de Sousa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1538AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
22 Mar 1545AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
18 Jul 1549ResignedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Sousa
Archbishop Manuel de Sousa , Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300, and Page 138
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast