Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bragança-Miranda

Dioecesis Brigantiensis-Mirandensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 27 May 1996
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Braga
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 6,545 (2,528 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bragancanet.pt/diocese/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Emidio Navarro 2, 5300-210 Braganca, Portugal
  • Telephone: 273.329.182
  • Fax: 273.300.361

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bragança
5 March 1770ErectedDiocese of Miranda (do Douro) Diocese of Bragança (erected)
Diocese of Bragança e Miranda
27 September 1780UnitedDiocese of Bragança
Diocese of Miranda (do Douro)
Diocese of Bragança e Miranda
20 April 1922Territory LostDiocese of Bragança e Miranda
Archdiocese of Braga
Diocese of Lamego
Diocese of Vila Real (erected)
Diocese of Bragança-Miranda
27 May 1996Name ChangedDiocese of Bragança e Miranda Diocese of Bragança-Miranda

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bragança e Miranda
1949210,100210,100100.0%232323589445315ap1951
1959231,500232,00099.8%2453248933397315ap1960
1970241,900242,000100.0%200112111,14624165315ap1971
1980208,500209,50099.5%17131741,1987107315ap1981
1990175,600188,00093.4%12051251,4047129322ap1991
Diocese of Bragança-Miranda
1999155,600157,71698.7%11971261,23449127324ap2000
2000155,600157,91098.5%12061261,23448126324ap2001
2001155,600157,91098.5%11761231,26548132324ap2002
2002147,339148,83999.0%10771141,292411128324ap2003
2003147,339148,83999.0%10481121,315411122324ap2004
2004147,339148,83099.0%9981071,377410132324ap2005
2006147,300148,83999.0%10181091,351413128326ap2007
2012149,400151,90098.4%828901,660410104326ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013