Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Ribeiro Vieira e Brito

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1850Born
7 Jun 187323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
5 Mar 189241.7AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
27 Mar 189241.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
24 Dec 190151.5SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
8 Jan 190251.5ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
12 Jul 193585.1DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Ribeiro Vieira e Brito
Bishop Francisco José Ribeiro Vieira e Brito (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSobradelo, Archdiocese of Braga
Ordained BishopCathedral, Braga, Archdiocese of Braga

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 331
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 12
  • c34: CB, 24 Sep 2019
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast