Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Oliveira Calado

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Titular Bishop of Mauricastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1698³BornEstremoz
15 May 175253.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
15 May 175253.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
8 Oct 175253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
4 Dec 177778.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Oliveira Calado:
Bishop José de Oliveira Calado (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 281, and Page 451
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015