Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Souza

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1461Born
23 Oct 149534.8AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
11 Jul 150544.5AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
8 Jun 153271.4DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Diego de Souza
Archbishop Diego de Souza (born 1461, died ) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 218, and Page 110
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 138
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1495, Number 35*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast