Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Bento Martins Júnior

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1881BornArcos
25 Oct 190322.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 192847.1AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
15 Aug 192847.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
14 Jul 193251.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Braga, Portugal
14 Jul 193251.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
28 Sep 193251.3SucceededArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
19 Aug 196382.2DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bento Martins Júnior:
Archbishop Antonio Bento Martins Júnior (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015