Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Evangelista Pereira da Silva, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belém do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1708BornGouvães, Portugal
20 Sep 173224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
17 Jun 177162.8AppointedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
28 Oct 177163.2Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
14 May 178273.7DiedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Evangelista Pereira da Silva:
Bishop João Evangelista Pereira da Silva T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013