Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Arles

Suppressed

To: Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Arles
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Arles (erected)
Archdiocese of Arles
417ElevatedDiocese of Arles Archdiocese of Arles
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Arles (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
Archdiocese of Arles
10 July 1817RestoredArchdiocese of Arles
6 October 1822SuppressedArchdiocese of Arles (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014