Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio José Gomes Cardoso

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1855Born
20 Sep 187923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
17 Dec 190045.0AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
17 Dec 190045.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
25 Mar 190145.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
23 Jul 190145.6AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
12 Aug 190448.7DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Gomes Cardoso
Bishop Antonio José Gomes Cardoso (born , died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerapico, Portugal

  • a priest for 24.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,109
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 119
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast