Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando de Guerra

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jul 1409AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
18 Jun 1414AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
15 Dec 1417AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
26 Sep 1467DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Guerra:
Archbishop Fernando de Guerra (died ) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 144, and Page 407
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 452
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013