Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eurico Dias Nogueira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1923Born
22 Dec 194522.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 196441.3AppointedBishop of Vila Cabral, Mozambique
6 Dec 196441.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vila Cabral, Mozambique
19 Feb 197248.9AppointedBishop of Sá da Bandeira, Angola
3 Feb 197753.9ResignedBishop of Sá da Bandeira, Angola
3 Nov 197754.6AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
5 Jun 199976.2RetiredArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
19 May 201491.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Eurico Dias Nogueira (VIAF: 9581872)
Archbishop Eurico Dias Nogueira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDornelas do Zêzere

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: CB, 19 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 12 Sep 2017