Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Maria da Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1910Born
21 May 193222.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 195646.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
20 Dec 195646.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
31 Mar 195747.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
12 Dec 196353.7AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
14 Apr 197767.0DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco Maria da Silva
Archbishop Francisco Maria da Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurtosa

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast