Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho Joaquim Lopes de Moura, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Portalegre-Castelo Branco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1911BornFolhadela
17 Jun 193423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 Dec 195241.9AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
26 Apr 195342.2Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
25 Sep 197867.6ResignedBishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal
29 Nov 198978.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Agostinho Joaquim Lopes de Moura:
Bishop Agostinho Joaquim Lopes de Moura C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Portalegre-Castelo Branco

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015