Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Maria da Silva Torres, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Braga

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1800BornVitória, Portugal
22 Feb 182322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Apr 184342.5SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
19 Jun 184342.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
22 Dec 184848.2ResignedArchbishop of Goa, India
22 Dec 184848.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
17 Feb 185150.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Braga, Portugal
7 Nov 185454.1DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Maria da Silva Torres:
Archbishop José Maria da Silva Torres O.S.B. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Braga

  • a priest for 31.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 156, and Page 436
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013