Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Ferreira da Costa Ortiga

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1944 BornBrufe
9 Jul 196723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
9 Nov 198743.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
9 Nov 198743.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
3 Jan 198843.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
5 Jun 199955.3AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jorge Ferreira da Costa Ortiga:
Archbishop Jorge Ferreira da Costa Ortiga (born ) Archbishop of Braga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Braga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Jul 2014