Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josť de Menezes

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Apr 1680AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
14 May 1685AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
10 Mar 1692AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
16 Feb 1696DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Josť de Menezes:
Archbishop Josť de Menezes (died ) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013