Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Paulo Cardinal de Figuereido da Cunha e Melo

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1770Born
16 Dec 184272.4SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Apr 184372.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
10 Sep 184373.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
30 Sep 185080.2Elevated to Cardinal
31 Dec 185585.5DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Pedro Paulo de Figuereido da Cunha e Melo (VIAF: 100035035)
Pedro Paulo Cardinal de Figuereido da Cunha e Melo (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaveiro, Diocese of Coimbra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Braga, Archdiocese of Braga
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Braga, Archdiocese of Braga

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018