Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Alfonso de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1912BornSubportela
12 Jul 193624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
10 Feb 195340.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angra, Portugal
10 Feb 195340.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhaedestus
3 May 195341.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhaedestus
17 Jun 195745.3SucceededBishop of Angra, Portugal
13 Dec 197866.8DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Alfonso de Carvalho:
Bishop Manuel Alfonso de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015