Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ferreira Cabral

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Titular Bishop of Dumium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1918BornSâo Roche de Faial
28 Feb 194224.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 196546.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
16 Jan 196546.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
25 May 196547.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obbi
3 Jul 196749.3AppointedBishop of Beira, Mozambique
1 Jul 197153.3ResignedBishop of Beira, Mozambique
21 Oct 197254.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
21 Oct 197254.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dumium
12 Dec 198163.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Beira, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ferreira Cabral:
Bishop Manuel Ferreira Cabral (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015