Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Eugénio Fernandes Dias

Bishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1948 BornLongos Vales
13 Jun 197425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
10 Nov 200051.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
10 Nov 200051.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamata
21 Jan 200152.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamata
8 Sep 200859.7AppointedBishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonino Eugénio Fernandes Dias:
Bishop Antonino Eugénio Fernandes Dias (born ) Bishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portalegre-Castelo Branco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013