Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Francisco Martins Pinheiro

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Braga

Titular Bishop of Dumium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1925BornVila Praia de Ancora
8 Jul 195126.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 198559.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
16 Feb 198559.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dumium
28 Apr 198559.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dumium
10 Nov 200075.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
4 Jun 201085.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Carlos Francisco Martins Pinheiro:
Bishop Carlos Francisco Martins Pinheiro (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Braga

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013