Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joachim Rodrigues Lima, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bombay, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1875Born
31 Jul 191843.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 May 192852.9AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
2 Dec 192853.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bombay, India
25 Dec 192853.6InstalledArchbishop of Bombay, India
21 Jul 193661.1DiedArchbishop of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Joachim Rodrigues Lima
Archbishop Joachim Rodrigues Lima S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnha, Portugal

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast