Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Garcia Cordeiro

Bishop of Bragança-Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1967 BornVila Nova de Seles, Angola
16 Jun 199124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal
18 Jul 201144.1AppointedBishop of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal
2 Oct 201144.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança-Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Garcia Cordeiro:
Bishop José Manuel Garcia Cordeiro (born ) Bishop of Bragança-Miranda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bragança-Miranda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013