Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
23 March 1545 | Erected | Archdiocese of Braga | Diocese of Miranda (do Douro) (erected) |
5 March 1770 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Miranda (do Douro) | Diocese of Bragança (erected) |
27 September 1780 | United | Diocese of Bragança
Diocese of Miranda (do Douro) | Diocese of Bragança e Miranda |
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Mar 2023 |
✠