Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Coimbra

Dioecesis Conimbricensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 6th Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Braga
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 5,300 (2,047 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedecoimbra.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua do Brazil 45, 3030-175 Coimbra CODEX, Portugal
  • Telephone: 239.70.83.20
  • Fax: 239.70.83.21

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Coimbra (erected)
22 May 1545Territory LostDiocese of Coimbra Diocese of Leiria (erected)
12 April 1774Territory LostDiocese of Coimbra Diocese of Aveiro (erected)
30 September 1881Territory AddedDiocese of Leiria (suppressed) Diocese of Coimbra
17 January 1918Territory LostDiocese of Coimbra Diocese of Leiria (erected)
24 August 1938Territory LostDiocese of Coimbra
Diocese of Porto
Diocese of Viseu
Diocese of Aveiro (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950547,428571,25695.8%252102622,08911358254ap1951
1970578,584582,57899.3%260302901,99551550259ap1971
1980525,600575,00091.4%224402641,99073398265ap1981
1990588,000597,00098.5%203402432,41975392266ap1991
1999537,000546,00098.4%178412192,45269365266ap2000
2000537,000546,00098.4%172402122,53364360266ap2001
2001537,000546,00098.4%169402092,569658332267ap2002
2002508,000565,00089.9%167372042,490856337267ap2003
2003508,000565,00089.9%159381972,578860327264ap2004
2004508,000565,00089.9%157371942,618861302268ap2005
2006505,000562,00089.9%163321952,589854305268ap2007
2013500,000548,50091.2%134321663,0121349284269ap2014
2016500,000548,00091.2%125351603,1251343268269ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 196
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 132
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 171
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 95, to Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.8, 23 Apr 2019; Data: 28 May 2019

Quantcast