Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José de Souza Lima

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Ibora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1744Born
7 Feb 177328.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 180863.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
11 Jan 180863.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ibora
27 Mar 180864.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ibora
15 Apr 181167.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco José de Souza Lima
Bishop Francisco José de Souza Lima (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMattosinhos

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast