Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luís Pires

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jan 1450AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
24 Aug 1453AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
26 Nov 1464AppointedBishop of Évora, Portugal
8 Feb 1468AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
Mar 1480³DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luís Pires
Archbishop Luís Pires (died Mar 1480) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 110, and Page 149
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 218, and Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jul 2017