Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco José Villas-Boas Senra de Faria Coelho

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1961 Born
29 Jun 198625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Évora, Portugal
17 Apr 201453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
17 Apr 201453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Plestia
29 Jun 201453.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plestia
26 Jun 201857.2AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
2 Sep 201857.4InstalledArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Villas-Boas Senra de Faria Coelho
Archbishop Francisco José Villas-Boas Senra de Faria Coelho (born ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaputo, Mozambique
Ordained BishopCathedral, Évora, Archdiocese of Évora

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Évora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2014
  • c2+: CB, 19 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,193
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 29 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast