Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nuno Manuel dos Santos Almeida

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Titular Bishop of Ruspae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1962 BornPedrosinhas
19 Oct 198624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Viseu, Portugal
21 Nov 201553.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
21 Nov 201553.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
31 Jan 201653.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae

MicroData Summary for Nuno Manuel dos Santos Almeida
Bishop Nuno Manuel dos Santos Almeida (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Braga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 21 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 28 Jan 2016