Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ordo˝o Cardinal ┴lvarez

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1230¹BornSpain
23 May 127545.3AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
12 Mar 127848.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
12 Mar 127848.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 128555.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ordo˝o ┴lvarez
Ordo˝o Cardinal ┴lvarez (born 1230, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 7.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016