Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Basilio Cardinal Pompilj

Deceased

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

Cardinal-Bishop of Velletri

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1858BornSpoleto
15 Dec 188527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Jan 190849.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
191152.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
27 Nov 191153.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
27 Nov 191153.6Elevated to Cardinal
7 Apr 191354.9AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 May 191355.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
11 May 191355.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
28 May 191456.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
28 Oct 191456.5AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
22 Mar 191758.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri
5 May 193173.0DiedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Basilio Pompilj:
Basilio Cardinal Pompilj (born , died ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014