Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Mary O’Donnell

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brisbane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1897BornFethard, Ireland
15 Apr 192225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sale, Australia
9 Dec 194851.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brisbane, Australia
9 Dec 194851.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
17 Mar 194952.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
10 Apr 196568.2SucceededArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
5 Mar 197376.1RetiredArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
2 Nov 198083.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Mary O’Donnell:
Archbishop Patrick Mary O’Donnell (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brisbane

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Oct 2013