Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward John Doody

Deceased

Bishop of Armidale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1903Born
12 Mar 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
11 Mar 194844.2AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
22 Apr 194844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia
9 Apr 196864.3DiedBishop of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Edward John Doody
Bishop Edward John Doody (born , died ) Bishop of Armidale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisbane

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast