Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romolo Molaroni

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1858Born
30 Sep 191658.2AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
30 Nov 191658.4Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
14 Aug 191961.1DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Romolo Molaroni
Bishop Romolo Molaroni (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast